No. 21-540
Title:Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rick C. Sasso
Docketed:October 13, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(19A-PL-378)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 13, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2021Waiver of right of respondent Rick C. Sasso, M.D. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Oct 25 2021Response Requested. (Due November 24, 2021)
Nov 17 2021Brief of respondent Rick C. Sasso, M.D. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 01 2021Reply of Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
George Thomas Patton Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Bose, McKinney & Evans
777 6th Street, N.W.
Suite 510
Washington, DC 20001

gpatton@boselaw.com
202470-1944
Party name: Rick C. Sasso, M.D.