No. 21-538
Title:Dennis Reagle, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Roderick V. Lewis
Docketed:October 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1642)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Dennis Reagle
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Roderick Lewis