No. 21-533
Title:Brad Martin, Individually and as an Employee of the Arizona Department of Public Safety, et al., Petitioners
v.
Carlos Castro
Docketed:October 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16009)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to January 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 11, 2022.
Nov 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Police Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Timothy Berg
    Counsel of Record
Fennemore Craig P.C.
2394 E. Camelback Rd.
Suite 600
Phoenix, AZ 85016

tberg@fclaw.com
602-916-5421
Party name: Brad Martin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin L. RundallHonor Law Group
4450 S. Rural Road
Suite C-220
Tempe, AZ 85282-7020

602-282-0223
Party name: Carlos Castro
Other
Robert S. Lafferrandre
    Counsel of Record
Pierce Couch Hendirckson Baysinger & Green, LLP
1109 N. Francis Avenue
Oklahoma City, OK 73106

rlafferrandre@piercecouch.com
(405) 235-1611
Party name: National Police Association