No. 21-53
Title:James Dale Holcombe, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 15, 2021
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fifth District
   Case Numbers:(5D18-3338)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 1, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Waiver of right of respondent State of Florida to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 23 2021Response Requested. (Due September 22, 2021)
Sep 22 2021Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Oct 05 2021Reply of petitioner James Dale Holcombe filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Robert Ufferman
    Counsel of Record
Michael Ufferman Law Firm, P.A.
2022-1 Raymond Diehl Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308

ufferman@uffermanlaw.com
8503862345
Party name: James Dale Holcombe
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
Rebecca Rock McGuiganOffice of Florida Attorney General
444 Seabreeze Blvd.
Suite 500
Daytona Beach, FL 32118

rebecca.mcguigan@myfloridalegal.com
3862384990
Party name: State of Florida