No. 21-518
Title:AlixPartners, LLP, et al., Petitioners
v.
The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States
Docketed:October 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2653)
   Decision Date:July 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 08 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2021Brief of respondent The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2021Reply of petitioners AlixPartners, LLP, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 10 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution, Inc. GRANTED.
Dec 10 2021Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment in No. 21-401 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Dec 10 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-401. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-401. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Jan 27 2022The record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit has been electronically filed.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, March 23, 2022. VIDED.
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 23 2022Argued. For petitioners in 21-401: Roman Martinez, Washington, D. C. For petitioners in 21-518: Joseph T. Baio, New York, N. Y. For United States, as amicus curiae, supporting petitioners: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent in 21-401: Andrew R. Davies, New York, N. Y. For respondent in 21-518: Alexander A. Yanos, New York, N. Y. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Thomas Stancil
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
1875 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mstancil@willkie.com
202-303-1133
Party name: AlixPartners, LLP, et al.
Joseph T. BaioWillkie, Farr, Gallagher
One Citicorp Center
153 East 53rd Street
New York, NY 10022

jbaio@willkie.com
212-728-8203
Party name: AlixPartners, LLP, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Alexander Athan Yanos
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
90 Park Ave
New York, NY 10016

alex.yanos@alston.com
212-210-9584
Party name: The Fund for Protection of Investors' Rights in Foreign States
Other
Jonathan B. New
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
45 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10111

jnew@bakerlaw.com
212-589-4650
Party name: George A. Bermann, Robert H. Smit, D. Brian King, Ruth Teitelbaum, And Lucas Bent
John B. Pinney
    Counsel of Record
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
312 Walnut Street, Ste. 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

jpinney@graydon.com
513-629-2730
Party name: International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution, Inc.