No. 21-511 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tim Shoop, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Raymond A. Twyford, III
Docketed:October 6, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3346)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2021 to December 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2021.
Nov 05 2021Brief amici curiae of Utah and 14 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2021Brief of respondent Raymond Twyford in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Raymond Twyford.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Reply of petitioner Tim Shoop, Warden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 14 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 14 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 21 2022Joint motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 25 2022Brief of petitioner Tim Shoop filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Brief amici curiae of State of Utah and 20 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, April 26, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Mar 16 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 16 2022Opposition to motion of the Solicitor General filed by petitioner Tim Shoop.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 16 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER. Also available are documents that has been electronically filed.
Mar 19 2022Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Raymond Twyford.
Main Document
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2022Brief of respondent Raymond Twyford filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of 18 Former Federal Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts General Hospital Center for Law, Brain & Behavior filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2022Reply of petitioner Tim Shoop filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 06 2022Motion to appoint counsel DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 14 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument is GRANTED IN PART, and the time is allotted as follows: 30 minutes for petitioner, 15 minutes for the Solicitor General, and 25 minutes for respondent.
Apr 25 2022Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent GRANTED, and Michael J. Benza, Esq., of Chagrin Falls, Ohio, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent in this case.
Apr 26 2022Argued. For petitioner: Benjamin M. Flowers, Solicitor General, Columbus, Ohio. For United States, as amicus curiae: Nicole F. Reaves, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: David A. O'Neil, Washington, D. C.
Jun 21 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Alito, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Sotomayor and Kagan, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Solicitor General
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop
Attorneys for Respondent
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Raymond Twyford
Michael John BenzaLaw Office of Michael J. Benza, Inc
17850 Geauga Lake Road
Chagrin Falls, OH 44023

michael.benza@case.edu
2163191247
Party name: Raymond Twyford
Other
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
Utah Attorney General's Office
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah and 14 Other States
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
Utah Attorney General's Office
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah and 20 Other States
Christopher D. Man
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

cman@winston.com
202-282-5622
Party name: 18 Former Federal Judges
Christopher May Mason
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
Tower 46
55 West 46th Street
New York, NY 10036

cmason@nixonpeabody.com
(212) 940-3000
Party name: Massachusetts General Hospital Center for Law, Brain & Behavior
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
    Counsel of Record
O' Melveny & Myers
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jschneller@omm.com
213-430-8115
Party name: Law Professors
Reginald M. Turner
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicao, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
(312) 988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association