No. 21-51
Title:Central Payment Co., LLC, Petitioner
v.
Custom Hair Designs by Sandy, LLC, On Behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:July 14, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1677)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 11, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Waiver of right of respondent Custom Hair Designs by Sandy, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 18 2021Response Requested. (Due September 17, 2021)
Sep 17 2021Brief of respondents Custom Hair Designs by Sandy, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Reply of petitioner Central Payment Co., LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding
1700 Pensylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

aparrish@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Central Payment Co., LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Tyler William Hudson
    Counsel of Record
Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP
4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300
Kansas City, MO 64112

thudson@wcllp.com
8167011100
Party name: Custom Hair Designs by Sandy, LLC, et al.