No. 21-505
Title:Bank of America Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, as Assignee and Successor-in-Interest to FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund L.P., et al.
Docketed:October 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2719)
   Decision Date:March 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2021 to December 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Limited
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, as assignee and successor-in-interest to FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund L.P., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., et al.