No. 21-499
Title:Carlos Vega, Petitioner
v.
Terence B. Tekoh
Docketed:October 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-56414)
   Decision Date:January 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2021)
PetitionOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Carlos Vega