No. 21-496 | |
Title: | Martez L. Smith, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | October 4, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1117) |
Decision Date: | March 3, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 30 2021 | Motion (21M12) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. |
Jul 30 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 04 2021 | MOTION (21M12) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. |
Oct 04 2021 | Motion (21M12) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. |
Oct 21 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 27 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021. |
Nov 09 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Martez L. Smith filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 15 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Joseph R. Palmore Counsel of Record | Morrison & Foerster LLP 2100 L Street, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20037 jpalmore@mofo.com | 202-887-6940 |
Party name: Martez L. Smith | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |