No. 21-495
Title:Dennis Black, et al., Petitioners
v.
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Docketed:October 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1419)
   Decision Date:December 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 25, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2021Motion (21M11) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Jul 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021MOTION (21M11) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Motion (21M11) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Anthony F. Shelley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ashelley@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: Dennis Black, et al.