No. 21-482 | |
Title: | Hassan Sharif Ali, aka Big Hassan, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | September 30, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-4433) |
Decision Date: | March 19, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 30, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 27 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 20 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 27 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021. |
Nov 15 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Mark Christopher Fleming Counsel of Record | WilmerHale 60 State Street Boston, MA 02109 mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com | 6175266000 |
Party name: Hassan Sharif Ali | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |