No. 21-48
Title:Shenandoah Valley Juvenile Center Commission, Petitioner
v.
John Doe 5, et al., By and Through Their Next Friend, Nelson Dolores Lopez, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Docketed:July 14, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1910)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 9, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 09 2021Waiver of right of respondent John Doe 4 to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 30 2021Response Requested. (Due September 29, 2021)
Sep 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2021 to October 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2021.
Oct 21 2021Letter of October 19, 2021, regarding substiution of parties, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Alan Botkins
    Counsel of Record
Litten & Sipe, L.L.P.
410 Neff Avenue
Harrisonburg, VA 22812

jason.botkins@littensipe.com
(540)437-3066
Party name: Shenandoah Valley Juvenile Center Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection
600 New Jersey Ave NW
Washington, DC 20001

kbc74@georgetown.edu
202-716-7102
Party name: John Doe 5, et al.