No. 21-477
Title:Jason Self, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cher-Ae Heights Indian Community of the Trinidad Rancheria
Docketed:September 29, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A158632)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 28, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Amicus brief of Seneca County, New York submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Jason Self, et al.
Other
Brian Laudadio
    Counsel of Record
Bond Schoeneck & King, PLLC
350 Linden Oaks
Third Floor
Rochester, NY 14625

blaudadio@bsk.com
585-362-4700
Party name: Seneca County, New York