No. 21-476
Title:303 Creative LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Aubrey Elenis, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1413)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2021 to December 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Oct 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2021Amicus brief of Institute for Faith and Family and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Amicus brief of The Cato Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kristen Kellie Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

kwaggoner@adflegal.org
571-707-4655
Party name: 303 Creative LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric Reuel Olson
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway
10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

eric.olson@coag.gov
720-508-6548
Party name: Aubrey Elenis, et al.
Other
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
111 Magnolia Lane
Hubert, NC 28539

lawyerdeborah@outlook.com
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family and Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute