No. 21-471
Title:John Doe 1, et al., Petitioners
v.
Express Scripts, Inc., et al.
Docketed:October 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-346)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 26, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 25 2021Motion (21M3) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Jun 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2021MOTION (21M3) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Motion (21M3) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Nov 03 2021Brief of respondent Express Scripts, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Brief of respondent Anthem, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pension Rights Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Reply of petitioners John Doe 1, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 13 2021The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris and Maher LLP
777 S. Figueroa Street
Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

pstris@stris.com
(213) 995-6800
Party name: John Doe 1, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Glenn Michael Kurtz
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

gkurtz@whitecase.com
+1 212 819 8252
Party name: Anthem, Inc.
Derek L. Shaffer
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

derekshaffer@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Express Scripts, Inc.
Other
Teresa S. Renaker
    Counsel of Record
Renaker Hasselman Scott LLP
505 Montgomery St
Suite 1125
San Francisco, CA 94111

teresa@renakerhasselman.com
4156531734
Party name: Pension Rights Center