No. 21-469
Title:Tony B. Jobe, Esquire, Petitioner
v.
National Transportation Safety Board
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-30033)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2021 to November 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 29, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Naomi Jean Scotten
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

nscotten@orrick.com
(212) 506-5116
Party name: Tony B. Jobe, Esquire
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: National Transportation Safety Board