No. 21-468
Title:National Pork Producers Council, et al., Petitioners
v.
Karen Ross, in Her Official Capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food & Agriculture, et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55631)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2021Waiver of right of respondents Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture, et al. to respond filed.
Oct 11 2021Waiver of right of respondents The Humane Society of the United States, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Animal Equality, The Humane League, Farm Sanctuary, Compassion In World Farming USA, Animal Outlook to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, National Pork Producers Council, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 13 2021Waiver of National Pork Producers Council, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (October 19, 2021)
Oct 19 2021Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2021)
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Canadian Pork Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2021 to December 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 01 2021Response to motion for an extension of time from petitioner National Pork Producers Council, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Chamber Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Iowa Pork Producers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
3127017829
Party name: National Pork Producers Council, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture; Tomas Aragon, Director of the Department of Public Health; Rob Bonta, Attorney General
Bruce Andrew Wagman
    Counsel of Record
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
456 Montgomery Street
16th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

bwagman@rshc-law.com
415-275-8550
Party name: The Humane Society of the United States, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Animal Equality, The Humane League, Farm Sanctuary, Compassion In World Farming USA, Animal Outlook
Richard Matthew WiseCalifornia Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street, Suite 125
Sacramento, CA 94244

Matthew.Wise@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6046
Party name: Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture; Tomas Aragon, Director of the Department of Public Health; Rob Bonta, Attorney General
Other
Stephan E. Becker
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1200 Seventeenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

stephan.becker@pillsburylaw.com
(202) 663-8000
Party name: Canadian Pork Council
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Indiana, et al.
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: North Carolina Chamber Legal Institute, North Carolina Pork Council, North Carolina Farm Bureau, and 11 Other State Farm Bureaus, Pork Councils, and Business Groups
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026374881
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers and National Cattlemen’s Beef Association
Eldon L. McAfee
    Counsel of Record
Brick Gentry PC
6701 Westown Parkway
Suite 100
West Des Moines, IA 50266

eldon.mcafee@brickgentrylaw.com
5152715916
Party name: Iowa Pork Producers Association, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute