No. 21-465
Title:James L. Kisor, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1929)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 30, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2021 to November 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 29, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: James L. Kisor
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs