No. 21-463
Title:Whole Woman's Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Austin Reeve Jackson, Judge, District Court of Texas, 114th District, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-50792)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2021Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Oct 18 2021Petitioners’ motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is granted, and respondents are directed to file a response to the petition on or before noon on Thursday, October 21, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Marc Andrew Hearron
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
1634 Eye St NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

mhearron@reprorights.org
202-524-5539
Party name: Whole Woman's Health, et al.