No. 21-462
Title:Jolie Johnson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC
Docketed:September 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11624)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 12 2021Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2021)
Nov 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Jolie Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Thomas Raupp
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell LLP
4801 Main Street, Suite 1000
Kansas City, MO 64112

michael.raupp@huschblackwell.com
816-983-8000
Party name: Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC