No. 21-454
Title:Michael Sackett, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:September 24, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35469)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michael Sackett, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 24, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Michael Sackett, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.