No. 21-453
Title:Uber Technologies, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Jonathon Gregg
Docketed:September 23, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B302925)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 30, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn &Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7000
Party name: Uber Technologies, Inc.