No. 21-444 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Andre Lee Thomas, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-70002)
   Decision Date:April 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Prosecutors and Judges filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2021 to December 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 7, 2021.
Dec 07 2021Brief of respondent Lumpkin, TDCJ in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 17 2021Reply of petitioner Andre Thomas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 05 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 11 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 18 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 11 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 22 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 01 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 15 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 22 2022Rescheduled.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Mar 28 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 12 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 19 2022Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
Apr 25 2022Rescheduled.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Record Requested.
Aug 15 2022Record received from the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas (4 boxes of state court records).
Sep 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/7/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maurie Amanda Levin
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
614 South 4th Street
#346
Philadelphia, PA 19147

maurielevin@gmail.com
512-294-1540
Party name: Andre Thomas
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Lumpkin, TDCJ
Other
Demian Alexander Ordway
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

dordway@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Former Prosecutors and Judges