No. 21-443 | |
Title: | William Beaumont Hospital, Petitioner v. United States, ex rel. David Felten |
Docketed: | September 22, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1002) |
Decision Date: | March 31, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 2, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 20 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 12 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America, ex rel. David L. Felten, M.D., Ph.D. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 13 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021. |
Oct 14 2021 | Brief amici curiae of American Hospital Association, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 18 2021 | Response Requested. (Due November 17, 2021) |
Nov 08 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 09 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2021. |
Dec 17 2021 | Brief of respondent United States of America, ex rel. David L. Felten, M.D., Ph.D. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 04 2022 | Reply of petitioner William Beaumont Hospital filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 05 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022. |
Jan 24 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal Counsel of Record | Hogan Lovells US LLP 555 Thirteenth St., N.W. Washington, DC 20004 neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | 202 637 5528 |
Party name: William Beaumont Hospital | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jason Scott Marcus Counsel of Record | Bracker & Marcus LLC 3355 Lenox Road Suite 660 Atlanta, GA 30326 jason@fcacounsel.com | 770-988-5035 |
Party name: United States of America, ex rel. David L. Felten, M.D., Ph.D. | ||
Other | ||
Chad Ian Golder Counsel of Record | 514 6th Street, NE Washington, DC 20002 golderlawoffice@gmail.com | 203-506-0670 |
Party name: American Hospital Association, Federation Of American Hospitals, Michigan Health & Hospital Association, Kentucky Hospital Association, Ohio Hospital Association, and Tennessee Hospital Association |