No. 21-442 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Rodney Reed, Petitioner
v.
Bryan Goertz, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-70022)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021. See Rule 30.1
Oct 22 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Texas Exonerees Michael Morton and Anthony Graves, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2021 to January 5, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 5, 2022.
Dec 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2022 to January 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 19, 2022.
Jan 19 2022Brief of respondents Bryan Goertz, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2022Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Constitutional Accountability Center GRANTED.
Apr 25 2022Petition GRANTED.
May 02 2022Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 1, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 23, 2022.
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 11, 2022.
Jun 22 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rodney Reed
Blanket Consent
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 5th Circuit.
Jun 24 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Bryan Goertz, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 01 2022Brief of Rodney Reed submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2022Joint Appendix submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

parker.rider-longmaid@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Rodney Reed
Attorneys for Respondents
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Bryan Goertz, et al.
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Craig E. Stewart
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 California Street
Floor 26
San Francisco, CA 94104

cestewart@jonesday.com
(415) 875-5714
Party name: Texas Exonerees Michael Morton and Anthony Graves, the Innocence Network, and The Constitution Project at the Project on Government Oversight