No. 21-441
Title:Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust, Petitioner
v.
John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2240, 19-2255)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Nov 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondent John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 31 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 24 2022Brief of petitioner Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2022Brief amici curiae of Acadiana Management Group, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of USA Sales, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2022Brief amici curiae of John Q. Hammons Hotels & Resorts, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, April 18, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 21 2022The record from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court Eastern District of Virginia is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2022Brief of respondent John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4 filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 08 2022Reply of petitioner Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2022Argued. For petitioner: Daniel L. Geyser, Dallas, Tex. For respondent: Curtis E. Gannon, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

daniel.geyser@haynesboone.com
303-382-6219
Party name: Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4
Other
Christopher John DiPompeo
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

cdipompeo@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator
Bradley Loy Drell
    Counsel of Record
Gold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell, APLC
2001 Macarthur Dr
Alexandria, LA 71301

bdrell@goldweems.com
3184456471
Party name: ACADIANA MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, et al.
Steven Paul Lehotsky
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

steve@lehotskykeller.com
(512) 693-8350
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
A. Lavar Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of A. Lavar Taylor
3 Hutton Centre Drive
Suite 500
Santa Ana, CA 92707

ltaylor@taylorlaw.com
714-546-0445
Party name: USA Sale, Inc.
Nicholas Jay Zluticky
    Counsel of Record
Stinson LLP
1201 Walnut Street, Suite 2900
Kansas City, MO 64106-2150

nicholas.zluticky@stinson.com
(816) 691-3278
Party name: John Q. Hammons Hotels & Resorts et al.