No. 21-439 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Michael Nance, Petitioner
v.
Timothy C. Ward, Commissioner, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11393)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 22 2021Motion of Legal Scholars and Academics for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (October 25, 2021)
Oct 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Scholars and Academics.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Michael Nance
Attorneys for Respondents
Clint Christopher Malcolm
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square, S.W.
Atlanta, GA 30334

cmalcolm@law.ga.gov
404-458-3619
Party name: Comm'r, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al.
Other
Bruce H. Schneider
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

bschneider@stroock.com
(212) 806-5400
Party name: Legal Scholars and Academics