No. 21-429
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Linked with 21A168
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1203)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of Oklahoma
Blanket Consent
Oct 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Cities of Tulsa and Owasso, Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2021Brief amici curiae of the Oklahoma District Attorneys Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2021Brief of respondent Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Chickasaw Nation and Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2021Application (21A168) to file reply brief in excess of word limits, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Response of Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta to application filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Application (21A168) denied by Justice Gorsuch.
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 08 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 21 2022Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. The case will be set for argument in the April 2022 argument session. Petitioner's brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Monday, February 28, 2022. Respondent's brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Monday, March 28, 2022. The reply brief is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3.
Feb 09 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Oklahoma.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 09 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Oklahoma
Blanket Consent
Feb 10 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta
Blanket Consent
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 28 2022Brief of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of The Oklahoma District Attorneys Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Oklahoma Association of Chiefs of Police filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Equal Rights Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of City of Tulsa, Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Motion for leave to file appendix to amicus curiae brief under seal filed by City of Tulsa, Oklahoma.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, April 27, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma, and also from the Tulsa County District Court.
Mar 22 2022Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma. (1 Box)
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2022Record received from the U.S. District Court for Tulsa County. (1 Box)
Mar 28 2022Brief of respondent Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Cherokee Nation, Chickasaw Nation, Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma, Muscogee (Creek) Nation, and Seminole Nation of Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Federal Indian Law Scholars and Historians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Former United States Attorneys Michael Cotter, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of The Navajo Nation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of United Keetoowah Band of Cherokee Indians in Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 04 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Motion of City of Tulsa, Oklahoma for leave to file an appendix to an amicus curiae brief under seal GRANTED.
Apr 14 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Apr 15 2022Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2022Argued. For petitioner: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Zachary C. Schauf, Washington, D. C.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Apr 29 2022Letter of the Solicitor General correcting statements made during oral argument filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jun 29 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kavanaugh, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Alito, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined.
Aug 01 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED
Aug 01 2022MANDATE ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Victor Manuel Castro-Huerta
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ze-wen Julius Chen
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

chenj@akingump.com
202-887-4475
Party name: Federal Indian Law Scholars and Historians
Klint Austin Cowan
    Counsel of Record
Fellers, Snider, Blankenship, Bailey & Tippens
100 N. Broadway, Suite 1700
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

kcowan@fellerssnider.com
(405) 232-0621
Party name: United Keetoowah Band of Cherokee Indians in Oklahoma
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Colby Daniel Duren
    Counsel of Record
National Congress of American Indians
1516 P Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

cduren@ncai.org
(202) 466-7767
Party name: National Congress of American Indians
Troy A. Eid
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig LLP
1144 15th Street
Suite 3300
Denver, CO 80202

eidt@gtlaw.com
3035726521
Party name: Former United States Attorneys Michael Cotter, D. Michael Dunavant, Halsey B. Frank, Troy A. Eid, Thomas B. Hefflelfinger, David Iglesias, Brendan V. Johnson, Wendy Olson, Timothy Q. Purdon, and R. Trent Shores
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Drive
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
(949) 451-3805
Party name: City of Tulsa, Oklahoma
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: Cities of Tulsa and Owasso, Oklahoma
Robert Harlan Henry
    Counsel of Record
Robert Henry Law Firm
512 N. Broadway Ave.
Suite 230
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

rh@rhhenrylaw.com
405-516-7824
Party name: Cherokee Nation, Chickasaw Nation, Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma, Muscogee (Creek) Nation, and Seminole Nation of Oklahoma
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation and Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Lawrence A. Kogan
    Counsel of Record
The Kogan Law Group, P.C.
100 United Nations Plaza
Suite #14f
New York, NY 10017

lkogan@koganlawgroup.com
(917) 565-1521
Party name: Citizens for Equal Rights Foundation
Andrew William Lester
    Counsel of Record
Spencer Fane LLP
9400 North Broadway Extension
Suite 600
Oklahoma City, OK 73114

alester@spencerfane.com
4058449900
Party name: Oklahoma Association of Chiefs of Police
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Mary Kathryn Nagle, Esq.
P.O. Box 506
McLean, VA 22101

mkn@mknaglelaw.onmicrosoft.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation
Lynn H. Slade
    Counsel of Record
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.
500 Fourth Street N,.W., Suite 1000
Albuquerque, NM 87102

lynn.slade@modrall.com
505-848-1800
Party name: Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al
Paul Wesley Spruhan
    Counsel of Record
Navajo Nation Department of Justice
P.O. Box 2010
Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515

pspruhan@nndoj.org
928-871-6210
Party name: The Navajo Nation, et al.
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, Kansas, Louisiana, and Nebraska
Katherine Crawford Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
700 Colorado Blvd.
Unit 407
Denver, CO 80206

katie@lehotskykeller.com
(303) 717-4749
Party name: The Oklahoma District Attorneys Association, The Oklahoma Sheriffs' Association, The Association of Oklahoma Narcotic Enforcers and The 27 Oklahoma District Attorneys