No. 21-427
Title:William Frederick Lamoureux, Petitioner
v.
Montana
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(DA 18-0639)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2021Waiver of right of respondent State of Montana to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 14 2021Response Requested. (Due November 15, 2021)
Nov 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2021 to December 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fred Anthony Rowley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
633 W. 5th Street
Fifteenth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

fred.rowley@wsgr.com
323.210.2902
Party name: William Frederick Lamoureux
Attorneys for Respondent
David Morgan Steven DeWhirst
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
4064442026
Party name: State of Montana