No. 21-420 | |
Title: | Postmates, LLC, fka Postmates, Inc., Petitioner v. Wendy Santana |
Docketed: | September 17, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
Case Numbers: | (B296413) |
Decision Date: | January 29, 2021 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | April 14, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 13 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 06 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2021 to December 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 1, 2021. |
Dec 01 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Wendy Santana to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022. |
Dec 13 2021 | Response Requested. (Due January 12, 2022) |
Jan 04 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 12, 2022 to March 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 05 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 14, 2022. |
Mar 02 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2022 to May 13, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 03 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 13, 2022. |
May 03 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2022 to August 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 04 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 11, 2022. |
Aug 04 2022 | Motion of Wendy Santana for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (August 05, 2022 --corrected version to be submitted) |
Aug 08 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 11, 2022 to September 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Aug 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 12, 2022. |
Sep 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2022 to October 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 12, 2022. |
Oct 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2022 to November 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 14, 2022. See Rule 30.1. |
Oct 18 2022 | Joint motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 20 2022 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Theane Evangelis Kapur Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP 333 South Grand Ave. 48th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90071 tevangelis@gibsondunn.com | 213.229.7726 |
Party name: Postmates, LLC (F/K/A Postmates, Inc.) | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kitty Kit Yee Szeto Counsel of Record | Parris Law Firm 43364 10th Street West Lancaster, CA 93534 kitty@parris.com | 6619492595 |
Party name: Wendy Santana |