No. 21-418
Title:Joseph A. Kennedy, Petitioner
v.
Bremerton School District
Docketed:September 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35222)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 19, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph A. Kennedy
Blanket Consent
Sep 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2021 to December 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Bremerton School District
Blanket Consent
Oct 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Professional Football Players Steve Largent and Chad Hennings filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Current State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Coach Tommy Bowden filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chaplain Alliance For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Galen Black filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pennsylvania Family Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Four States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Joseph A. Kennedy
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, N.W.
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
2024663234
Party name: Bremerton School District
Other
Katherine Elizabeth Demarest
    Counsel of Record
Alaska Department of Law
1031 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

kate.demarest@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5172
Party name: Twenty-Four States
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Steven Timothy Collis
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas School of Law
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

steven.collis@law.utexas.edu
720-226-6733
Party name: Galen Black
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Chaplain Alliance For Religious Liberty
Adam Michael Foslid
    Counsel of Record
Stumphauzer Foslid Sloman Ross & Kolaya, PLLC
2 S. Biscayne Blvd.
Suite 1600
Miami, FL 33131

afoslid@sfslaw.com
(305) 614-1400
Party name: Coach Tommy Bowden
Ryan Anthony Kriegshauser
    Counsel of Record
Kriegshauser Ney Law Group
15050 W. 138th St., Unit 4493
Olathe, KS 66063

ryan@knlawgroup.com
913-303-0639
Party name: Current State Legislators
Donald Francis McGahn II
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

DMcGahn@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Members of Congress
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Young America's Foundation, Alliance Defending Freedom, and 69 Additional Organizations and Individuals
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Former Professional Football Players Steve Largent and Chad Hennings
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Pennsylvania Family Institute