No. 21-417 | |
Title: | Sulzer Mixpac AG, Petitioner v. A&N Trading Company, et al. |
Docketed: | September 16, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-2951) |
Decision Date: | February 18, 2021 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 6, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 16 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 18 2021 | Brief amicus curiae of the International Trademark Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 18 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Law Professors filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 18 2021 | Brief amici curiae of International Anticounterfeiting Coalition, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service | |
Oct 21 2021 | Letter of petitioner Sulzer Mixpac AG pertaining to Rule 29.6 filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 02 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021. |
Nov 08 2021 | Response Requested. (Due December 8, 2021) |
Dec 02 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 8, 2021 to January 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Dec 03 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 7, 2022. |
Jan 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2022 to February 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 06 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 7, 2022. |
Feb 07 2022 | Brief of respondents A&N Trading Company, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 22 2022 | Reply of petitioner Sulzer Mixpac AG filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 23 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022. |
Mar 21 2022 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Lisa Schiavo Blatt Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 725 12th Street, NW Washington, DC 20005 lblatt@wc.com | 202-434-5050 |
Party name: Sulzer Mixpac AG | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jack A. Gordon Counsel of Record | Kent, Beatty & Gordon, LLP 11 Times Square New York, NY 10036 jag@kbg-law.com | (212) 421-4300 |
Party name: A&N Trading Company, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Jason Patrick Bloom Counsel of Record | Haynes and Boone, LLP 2323 Victory Ave. Suite 700 Dallas, TX 75219 jason.bloom@haynesboone.com | 2142083181 |
Party name: The International Trademark Association | ||
Theodore H. Davis Jr. Counsel of Record | Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP 1100 Peachtree Street Suite 2800 Atlanta, GA 30309-4530 tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com | 4048156534 |
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors | ||
Jamaica Potts Szeliga Counsel of Record | Seyfarth Shaw LLP 975 F Street, NW Washington, DC 20004 jszeliga@seyfarth.com | 2028285364 |
Party name: International Anticounterfeiting Coalition, Industrial Designers Society of America, Inc. and Swissmem |