No. 21-406
Title:Impax Laboratories, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Federal Trade Commission
Docketed:September 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-60394)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2021 to November 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 15, 2021.
Oct 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jay Philip Lefkowitz
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
601 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10022

lefkowitz@kirkland.com
(212) 446-4800
Party name: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines