No. 21-404
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Washington, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35673)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 15, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2021 to November 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 15, 2021.
Nov 15 2021Brief of respondents Washington, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 01 2021Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Petition GRANTED.
Feb 23 2022Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2022Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, April 18, 2022.
Mar 15 2022Suggestion of mootness filed by respondents Washington, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 17 2022Response in opposition to respondents suggestion of mootness filed by petitioner United States. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and available on PACER.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of Workers' Injury Law & Advocacy Group filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2022Reply on suggestion of mootness filed by respondents Washington, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2022Brief of respondents Washington, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 11 2022Sur-reply in support of suggestion of mootness filed by respondents Washington, et al. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 13 2022Response in opposition to sur-reply in support of suggestion of mootness filed by petitioner United States. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 18 2022Argued. For petitioner: Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Tera M. Heintz, Deputy Solicitor General, Olympia, Wash.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noahp@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: Washington, et al.
Tera M. HeintzWashington State Attorney General's Office
1125 Washington Street SE, PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

360-753-6200
Party name: Washington, et al.
Other
Bobby G. Burke
    Counsel of Record
Bobby G. Burke, Esq.
308 N.W. 13 Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73103

bob@bobburkelaw.com
4058021495
Party name: Workers' Injury Law & Advocacy Group