No. 21-401
Title:ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Luxshare, Ltd.
Docketed:September 14, 2021
Linked with 21A80
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2736)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 1, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 14, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Brief of respondent Luxshare, Ltd. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2021Application (21A80) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 15 2021Response to application (21A80) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due Thursday, October 21, by 4 p.m.
Oct 21 2021Response to application from respondent Luxshare, Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Reply of applicants ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Application (21A80) referred to the Court.
Oct 27 2021Application (21A80) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, entered August 17, 2021, is stayed pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: ZF Automotive US, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Allen and Overy LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

andrewrhys.davies@allenovery.com
212 610 6300
Party name: Luxshare, Ltd.