No. 21-396
Title:Delta Air Lines, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Dev Anand Oman, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15124)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2021 to November 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Carl Helland
    Counsel of Record
Nichols Kaster LLP
235 Montgomery Street, Suite 810
San Francisco, CA 94104

helland@nka.com
4152771239
Party name: Dev Anand Oman, et al.