No. 21-395
Title:Kevin Owen McCarthy, et al., Petitioners
v.
Nancy Pelosi, in Her Official Capacity as Speaker of the House, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5240)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2021 to November 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2021.
Oct 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

taylor@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Kevin Owen McCarthy, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
5140 O'Neill House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: Nancy Pelosi, et al.
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence