No. 21-388
Title:John K. MacIver Institute for Public Policy, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Tony Evers, Governor of Wisconsin
Docketed:September 10, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1814)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2021.
Oct 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of the Honorable Scott Walker filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Amicus brief of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence not accepted for filing. (October 13, 2021--Corrected version to be submitted)
Oct 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson St.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: John K. MacIver Institute for Public Policy, INC., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gabe Johnson-Karp
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 West Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

johnsonkarpg@doj.state.wi.us
608-267-8904
Party name: Tony Evers
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: The Honorable Scott Walker
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute, Reason Foundation, Main Policy Institute