No. 21-383
Title:Wyoming, Petitioner
v.
William Thomas Mahaffy, V
Docketed:September 9, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wyoming
   Case Numbers:(S-20-0191)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Paul Zintak
    Counsel of Record
Wyoming Attorney General's Office
109 State Capitol
Cheyenne, WY 82002

timothy.zintak@wyo.gov
3077777841
Party name: State of Wyoming