No. 21-382
Title:Moses Strauss, et al., Petitioners
v.
Credit Lyonnais, S.A.
Docketed:September 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-865, 19-1285)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2021 to November 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2021.
Nov 12 2021Brief of respondent Credit Lyonnais, S.A. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2021Reply of petitioners Moses Strauss, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Moses Strauss, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan I. Blackman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary, Gottlieb et. al.
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006-0000

jblackman@cgsh.com
212-225-2490
Party name: Credit Lyonnais, S.A.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States