No. 21-381
Title:Tzvi Weiss, et al., Petitioners
v.
National Westminster Bank, PLC
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-863, 19-1159)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021.
Oct 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Defense of Democracies filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of 10 Members of the United States Senate filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Jewish Organizations and Allies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Tzvi Weiss, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan I. Blackman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary, Gottlieb et. al.
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006-0000

jblackman@cgsh.com
212-225-2490
Party name: National Westminster Bank PLC
Other
Glenn Ari Danas
    Counsel of Record
Robins Kaplan LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 3400
Los Angeles, CA 90067

gdanas@robinskaplan.com
3105520130
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Justin Clint Danilewitz
    Counsel of Record
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
Centre Square West, 1500 Market Street, 38th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102

justin.danilewitz@saul.com
(215) 972-1977
Party name: Jewish Organizations and Allies
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: 10 Members of the United States Senate
Michael A. Petrino
    Counsel of Record
Stein Mitchell Beato & Missner LLP
901 15th Street, NW, STE 700
Washington, DC 20005

mpetrino@steinmitchell.com
202-601-1604
Party name: Foundation for Defense of Democracies
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Law Professors