No. 21-379
Title:Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10545)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue, et al.