No. 21-376
Vide 21-377, 21-378, 21-380
Title:Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Linked with 21A555, 22A171
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-11479)
   Decision Date:April 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Motion of Chad E. Brackeen, et al. to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2021Motion of Texas to extend the time to file a response from October 8, 2021 to November 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Oct 06 2021Waiver of right of respondent Navajo Nation to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Casey Family Programs, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 08 2021Brief amici curiae of 180 Indian Tribes and 35 Tribal Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Oct 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 8, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Chad Everet Brackeen, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Texas in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 22 2021Reply of petitioners Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 21-377, 21-378, and 21-380 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. Parties that were plaintiffs/appellees in the lower courts shall file opening and reply briefs in conformity with Rules 33.1(g)(v) and 33.1(g)(vii), under the schedule set forth in Rules 25.1 and 25.3. Parties that were defendants/appellants in the lower courts shall file briefs in conformity with Rule 33.1(g)(vi), under the schedule set forth in Rule 25.2.
Feb 28 2022Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 21-376. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 21-376. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 18 2022Blanket Consent filed by Chad Everet Brackeen, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Mar 18 2022Blanket Consent filed by Texas. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Mar 18 2022Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Mar 29 2022Motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and the opening briefs on the merits is extended to and including May 26, 2022. The time to file the response briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 5, 2022. VIDED.
Mar 29 2022Application (21A555) to file consolidated briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to Justice Alito.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 31 2022Application (21A555) granted by Justice Alito to file consolidated briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits, provided that plaintiffs/appellees file two consolidated opening briefs on the merits of no more than 20,000 words each and two consolidated reply briefs on the merits of no more than 8,000 words each, and that defendants/appellants file three consolidated response briefs on the merits of no more than 22,500 words each.
May 26 2022Brief of plaintiff/appellee The State of Texas filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 26 2022Brief of plaintiffs/appellees Chad Everet Brackeen, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2022Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Goldwater Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Foster Parents and Pacific Legal Foundation in support of Chad Everet Brackeen, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Project on Fair Representation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2022Brief amici curiae of States of Ohio and Oklahoma filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Christian Alliance for Indian Child Welfare, et al. filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Academy of Adoption and Assisted Reproduction Attorneys, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance in support of Texas filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Equal Rights Foundation in support of neither party filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Cherokee Nation, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Navajo Nation
Blanket Consent
Aug 01 2022Motion for a further extension of time within which to file the response briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, November 9, 2022. VIDED.
Aug 03 2022Motion to further extend the time within which to file the response briefs on the merits granted, and the time is extended to and including August 12, 2022. VIDED.
Aug 12 2022Brief of defendants-appellants tribal parties filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2022Brief of defendants-appellants federal parties filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Counsel for the County of Los Angeles filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Aubrey Nelson and Sam Evans-Brown filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and Fourteen Affiliates filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 18 2022Brief amicus curiae of Senator James Abourezk filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law and Constitutional Law Professors, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2022Amicus brief of National Association of Counsel for Children and 30 other children's rights organizations not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief and PDF to be submitted.)
Aug 18 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Counsel for Children, et al. filed. VIDED. (Aug. 30, 2022)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Application (22A171) of plaintiffs/appellees to extend the time to file their consolidated reply briefs on the merits from September 12, 2022 to October 3, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Gregory Ablavsky filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Casey Family Programs, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Indian Law Professors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of 87 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Robyn Bradshaw filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Foster Children filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Family Defense Providers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of 497 Indian Tribes and 62 Tribal and Indian Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics and American Medical Association filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 19 2022Motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument filed by the Solicitor General. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 19 2022Amicus brief of American Historical Association and Organization of American Historians not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief and PDF to be submitted.)
Aug 19 2022Brief amici curiae of American Historical Association, et al. filed. VIDED. (Aug. 30, 2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2022CIRCULATED
Aug 25 2022Application (22A171) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file the reply briefs on the merits to and including October 3, 2022. VIDED.
Sep 12 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.
Sep 12 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 5th circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Sep 13 2022The record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas has been electronically filed.
Oct 03 2022Motion for divided argument and enlargement of time for oral argument filed by the Solicitor General GRANTED. VIDED.
Oct 03 2022Reply of plaintiff/appellee Texas filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Reply of plaintiffs/appellees Chad Everet Brackeen, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2022Argued. For Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.: Matthew D. McGill, Washington, D. C. For Texas: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex. For federal parties: Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For tribal parties: Ian H. Gershengorn, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Cherokee Nation, et al.
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mmcgill@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3680
Party name: Chad Everet Brackeen, et al.
Paul Wesley Spruhan
    Counsel of Record
Navajo Naton Department of Justice
P.O. Box 2010
Window Rock, Navajo Nation, AZ 86515

pspruhan@nndoj.org
(928) 871-6210
Party name: Navajo Nation
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas
Other
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
717 17th Street, Suite 1825
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-830-1776
Party name: American Academy of Pediatrics and American Medical Association
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: American Psychological Association, Society of Indian Psychologists, Indiana Psychological Association, Louisiana Psychological Association, and Texas Psychological Association
Ze-wen Julius Chen
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

chenj@akingump.com
202-887-4475
Party name: American Historical Association and Organization of American Historians
David Steven Coale
    Counsel of Record
Lynn Pinker Hurst & Schwegmann, LLP
2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700
Dallas, TX 75201

dcoale@lynnllp.com
(214) 981-3100
Party name: Administrative Law and Constitutional Law Professors
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Project on Fair Representation
Erin Christine Dougherty Lynch
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
745 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 502
Anchorage, AK 99501

dougherty@narf.org
(907) 276-0680
Party name: 497 Indian Tribes and 62 Tribal and Indian Organizations
Erin Christine Dougherty Lynch
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
745 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 502
Anchorage, AK 99501

dougherty@narf.org
9072760680
Party name: 180 Indian Tribes and 35 Tribal Organizations
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Boulevard
Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916.503.9060
Party name: Foster Parents and Pacific Legal Foundation
Kathryn Ann Eidmann
    Counsel of Record
Public Counsel
610 S. Ardmore Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90005

keidmann@publiccounsel.org
2133852977
Party name: National Association of Counsel for Children and 30 other children's rights organizations
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio and Oklahoma
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and Fourteen Affiliates
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Casey Family Programs and Ten Other Child Welfare and Adoption Organizations
Larry Stuart Jenkins
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
50 East South Temple Street, Suite 400
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

ljenkins@kmclaw.com
(801) 328-3600
Party name: Academy of Adoption and Assisted Reproduction Attorneys and National Council for Adoption
Lawrence A. Kogan
    Counsel of Record
The Kogan Law Group, P.C.
100 United Nations Plaza
Suite #14F
New York, NY 10017

lkogan@koganlawgroup.com
917-565-1521
Party name: Citizens for Equal Rights Foundation
Michelle T. Miano
    Counsel of Record
Barnhouse Keegan Solimon & West LLP
7424 4th Street NW
Los Ranchos de Albuquerque, NM 87107

mmiano@indiancountrylaw.com
505-842-6123
Party name: Professor Gregory Ablavsky
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Mary Kathryn Nagle, Esq.
P.O. Box 506
McLean, VA 22101

mkn@mknaglelaw.onmicrosoft.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center
April Erin Olson
    Counsel of Record
Rothstein Donatelli LLP
1501 West Fountainhead Parkway, Suite #360
Tempe, AZ 85282

aeolson@rothsteinlaw.com
4809219296
Party name: Aubrey Nelson and Sam Evans-Brown
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800
San Diego, CA 92101

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
619-738-9628
Party name: State of California
Rebecca Ann Patterson
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Miller and Monkman, LLP
510 L. Street, Suite 310
Anchorage, AK 99501

rebecca@sonosky.net
9072586377
Party name: Former Foster Children
Brian Rosner
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC, DC 20036

BRosner1517@gmail.com
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: Family Defense Providers
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute, et al.
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: 87 Members of Congress
Daniel P. Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Lakota People’s Law Project, The Romero Institute
210 High Street, Second Floor
Santa Cruz, CA 95060

daniel.sheehan@romeroinstitute.org
(831) 706-6826
Party name: Senator James Abourezk
Geoffrey D. Strommer
    Counsel of Record
Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP
215 SW Washington St.
Suite 200
Portland, OR 97204

gstrommer@hobbsstraus.com
5032421745
Party name: American Bar Association
Krystal Brunner Swendsboe
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

Kswendsboe@wiley.law
202-719-4197
Party name: Christian Alliance for Indian Child Welfare and ICWA Children and Families
Conor Denali Tucker
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP
633 West Fifth Street, Suite 1550
Los Angeles, CA 90071

ctucker@wsgr.com
(323) 210-2900
Party name: Robyn Bradshaw
Melania Vartanian
    Counsel of Record
Los Angeles
648 Kenneth Hahn Hall of Administration, 500 W. Temple Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012

mvartanian@counsel.lacounty.gov
2134185613
Party name: Counsel for the County of Los Angeles
April Dennise Youpee-Roll
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
350 South Grand Ave., 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

april.youpee-roll@mto.com
213-683-9536
Party name: Indian Law Professors