No. 21-374
Title:Steven Edward Struve, Petitioner
v.
Iowa
Docketed:September 8, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Iowa
   Case Numbers:(19-1614)
   Decision Date:February 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2021Waiver of Iowa of right to respond not accepted for filing. (September 10, 2021)
Sep 10 2021Waiver of right of respondent Iowa to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 18 2021Response Requested. (Due November 17, 2021)
Nov 16 2021Brief of respondent Iowa in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 01 2021Reply of Steven Edward Struve submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Steven Edward Struve
Attorneys for Respondent
Kevin Cmelik
    Counsel of Record
Iowa Department of Justice
Hoover State Office Building
Des Moines, IA 50319

Kevin.Cmelik@ag.iowa.gov
515-281-5976
Party name: State of Iowa