No. 21-365
Title:Branch Banking and Trust Company, Petitioner
v.
Sevier County Schools Federal Credit Union, et al.
Docketed:September 9, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5174)
   Decision Date:March 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 7, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2021 to November 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Oct 12 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Bankers Association, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 22 2021Response to motion from respondent Sevier County Schools Federal Credit Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Attorneys for Respondents
Donald K. Vowell
    Counsel of Record
The Vowell Law Firm
6718 Albunda Drive
Knoxville, TN 37919

don@vowell-law.com
865-292-0000
Party name: Sevier County Schools Federal Credit Union, et al.
Other
Mark Jay Levin
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

levinm@ballardspahr.com
(215) 665-8500
Party name: American Bankers Association, Bank Policy Institute, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and Consumer Bankers Association