No. 21-316
Title:Lorenzo Williams, Petitioner
v.
Steve Kallis, Warden
Docketed:August 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2671)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 14 2021Waiver of right of respondent Steve Kallis, Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Wallace L. Taylor
    Counsel of Record
4403 First Ave SE, Suite 402
Cedar Rapids, IA 52402

wtaylorlaw@aol.com
3193662428
Party name: Lorenzo Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Steve Kallis, Warden