No. 21-312
Title:Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ohio, ex rel. Dave Yost, Attorney General
Docketed:August 31, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2020-0092)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

giuffrar@sullcrom.com
212-558-3121
Party name: Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: State of Ohio ex rel. Dave Yost, Ohio Attorney General