No. 21-311
Title:Carrie S. Willis, Individually and as Trustee of the Trust of James C. and Norma D. Willis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2047)
   Decision Date:April 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to November 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 1, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kendall Kelly Alexis Turner
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

kendallturner@omm.com
7036061934
Party name: Carrie S. Willis, individually and as trustee of the Trust of James C. and Norma D. Willis
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America