No. 21-31
Title:Fast Auto Loans, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Joe Maldonado, et al.
Docketed:July 9, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Fourth Appellate District, Division Three
   Case Numbers:(G058645)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 28, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent Joe Maldonado, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 25 2021Response Requested. (Due September 24, 2021)
Sep 16 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Fast Auto Loans, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2021 to October 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 25, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Jay Levin
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street
51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

levinm@ballardspahr.com
(215) 665-8500
Party name: Fast Auto Loans, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael D. Singer
    Counsel of Record
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
605 C Street, Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92101

msinger@ckslaw.com
16195953001
Party name: Joe Maldonado, et al.